WYE VALLEY VOLUNTEERS INCORPORATING GOOD NEIGHBOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides services to those in need including a community transport scheme, home visiting, lunch club and coffee mornings for the elderly. The WVV Community Minibus facilitates several of these activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 17 June 1993: Standard registration
- WYE VALLEY VOLUNTEERS (Working name)
- WYE VALLEY VOLUNTEER BUREAU (Previous name)
- WYE VALLEY VOLUNTEERS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Beard | Chair | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Scarborough | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
WENDY FARMER | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Judge | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Harrison | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Bailey | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Martin Donlon | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH YEELES | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY OSBORN | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sue Tattersall | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE SMITH | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA GAREY | Trustee |
|
||||||
DOUGLAS FERGUSSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.13k | £1.98k | £7.13k | £8.19k | £16.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.29k | £14.65k | £10.66k | £19.71k | £17.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JULY 1984 AS AMENDED 10TH MAY 2001 AS AMENDED 22 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION SOCIAL SERVICES AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE PERSONS IN NEED
Area of benefit
BOURNE END, FLACKWELL HEATH, HEDSOR, LITTLE MARLOW AND WOOBURN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wye Valley Volunteers
Community Volunteer Office
Wakeman Road
Bourne End
SL8 5SX
- Phone:
- 01628521027
- Website:
-
Www.wyevalleyvolunteers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window