COMBE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Combe Pre-School provides a fun, safe and educational environment for children from the age of 2 until they enter primary school. Situated in the rooms adjacent to the Methodist Church and the only provider of pre-school education in the village Combe Pre-School also serves neighbouring villages. There are currently 8 employed teaching staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £51,895 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 June 1993: Standard registration
- COMBE PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Purssell | Chair | 05 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Danielle Sadler | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Baidoun | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lilly Christine Victoria St Pierre | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Colvin | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annapurna Parsonson | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.75k | £120.58k | £102.44k | £112.54k | £131.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.77k | £113.37k | £116.53k | £112.26k | £115.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.31k | £74.78k | £64.57k | £40.64k | £51.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1993 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 07/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Combe Hub
Park Road
Combe
Witney
OX29 8NA
- Phone:
- 01993898813
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window