Accounts and annual returns THRAPSTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1022606
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 19 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 02 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2009 24 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required