HAROLD AND MARJORIE MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees' principal activity is to expend the charity's income in the following main areas: 1) In education, by supporting promising pharmacy students who maybe in finacial difficulties, via hardship grants. 2) By funding teaching chairs, research projects and university awards programs, with an emphasis on community pharmacy initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 1993: Standard registration
- MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hartles | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Duncan | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Wragg | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.37k | £199.19k | £152.55k | £180.62k | £194.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.42k | £244.86k | £266.96k | £260.91k | £231.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 401 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2024 | 730 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 March 2024 | 766 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2022 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2022 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST MARCH 1993 AND A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8TH AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE KNOWLEDGE OF PHARMACY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY PROVIDING ENDOWMENTS AND OTHER FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THE TEACHING OF PHARMACY AT UNIVERSITIES FOR PHARMACY RESEARCH AT UNIVERSITIES AND BY AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE ANY PERSONS TO UNDERTAKE TRAINING AS PHARMACISTS (INCLUDING POST QUALIFICATION TRAINING) ON SUCH CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PHARMACISTS (INCLUDING RETIRED PHARMACISTS) AND AMONGST PHARMACISTS' EMPLOYEES AND THE EMPLOYEES OF ANY COMPANY OR PARTNERSHIP CONDUCTING A PHARMACY BUSINESS AND AMONGST THE WIDOWS WIDOWERS AND DEPENDANTS OF ANY DECEASED PHARMACIST OR OF ANY DECEASED PHARMACIST'S EMPLOYEE OR ANY DECEASED EMPLOYEE OF ANY SUCH COMPANY OR PARTNERSHIP. C) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE SETTLOR DURING HER LIFETIME MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT OR IN DEFAULT OF SUCH DIRECTION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE AND AFTER THE DEATH OF THE SETTLOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE HAVING REGARD TO ANY DIRECTIONS GIVEN OR WISHES EXPRESSED BY THE SETTLOR TO THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIPLEYS LLP
10 ORANGE STREET
LONDON
WC2H 7DQ
- Phone:
- 02073120000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window