Trustees 7TH FELTHAM SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1022716

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Owen | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aidan Robinson | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Bennett | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Owen | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL BRAH | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MEDLYCOTT | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATTI OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.