Financial history GREAT TOTHAM (EVENING) WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1022717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.13k £894 £1.17k £2.21k £1.52k
Total expenditure £1.06k £1.05k £1.96k £1.77k £1.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A