Accounts and annual returns THE LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1022729
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 06 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 14 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 06 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 13 October 2009 On Time