Financial history THE LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1022729
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £68.38k £70.84k £70.86k £67.52k £68.34k
Total expenditure £68.31k £71.68k £69.80k £70.52k £68.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A