THE LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide sessional daycare for children aged 2- 4 1/2 within our local and wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 17 June 1993: Standard registration
- 25 July 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 July 2011: Funds transferred to 1135947 LITTLE ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL (CHELMSFORD)
- UNDER FIVES PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.38k | £70.84k | £70.86k | £67.52k | £68.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.31k | £71.68k | £69.80k | £70.52k | £68.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 18 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 06 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 14 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 06 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 13 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVLOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHELMSFORD, ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window