Financial history HOLGATE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022746
Charity reporting is up to date (290 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £65.53k £74.21k £74.76k £80.09k £82.93k
Total expenditure £67.98k £63.73k £74.02k £80.80k £83.81k
Income from government contracts N/A £62.16k £66.21k £67.82k £68.99k
Income from government grants N/A £5.97k N/A £1.89k N/A