HOLGATE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022746
Charity reporting is up to date (290 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holgate Pre-School provides early years education for under 5s. It operates every week day in term time, for a maximum of 24 children. The pre-school is popular in the local community and there is a waiting list for new starters. The organisation is run by a committee of, mainly, parent volunteers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £82,931
Total expenditure: £83,807

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOLGATE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORRAINE MUSGROVE Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Chloe Guy Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Jennifer Robson Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Suzanne Parker Trustee 18 February 2021
None on record
Lydia Graham Trustee 12 February 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £65.53k £74.21k £74.76k £80.09k £82.93k
Total expenditure £67.98k £63.73k £74.02k £80.80k £83.81k
Income from government contracts N/A £62.16k £66.21k £67.82k £68.99k
Income from government grants N/A £5.97k N/A £1.89k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 April 2025 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 16 April 2025 290 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 09 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holgate Methodist Church
Acomb Road
York
YO24 4AE
Phone:
07957101801
Website:

Holgatepreschool.org.uk