Financial history CHATSWORTH HIGH ASSOCIATION OF PARENTS AND STAFF (C.H.A.P.S)

Charity Number: 1022748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.07k £0 £700 £1.53k £8.06k
Total expenditure £128 £195 £209 £200 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A