Accounts and annual returns DOMESTIC VIOLENCE COUNSELLING ADVISE REHABILITATION EDUCATION (D.V. CARE)

Charity number: 1022792
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2005 15 March 2006 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2004 21 March 2005 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not Required