BOTESDALE AND RICKINGHALL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a creative and secure environment in which children of pre-school age are given the opportunity to play & learn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £113,033 from 1 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 June 1993: Standard registration
- BOTESDALE AND RICKINGHALL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heidi Darlow | Chair | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Sayers | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nyomi Lambert | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Martin | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Irvine | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE CHAPPELL | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA VAUGHAN-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN SHAW | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MELODY RAMOS | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Megan Hails | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.66k | £69.24k | £81.05k | £113.83k | £138.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.10k | £89.63k | £64.32k | £92.29k | £134.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £112.84k | £56.60k | N/A | N/A | £113.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 July 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 July 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/1992 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/2011
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES; FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUP'S, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN ARID THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Village Hall
Diss Road
Botesdale
DISS
IP22 1DD
- Phone:
- 07796014304
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window