DURHAM NORTH COUNTY GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a varied and structured programme of activities, delivered by trained volunteer leaders, to enable girls and young women to reach their full potential. Section age groups as below:- Rainbows 4 to 7 years Brownies 7 to 10 years Guides 10 to 14 years Senior section 14 to 25 years Adult leaders 18 to 65 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 18 June 1993: Standard registration
- DURHAM NORTH GUIDE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- DURHAM NORTH GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- GIRLGUIDING DURHAM NORTH (Working name)
- DURHAM NORTH COUNTY GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Smith | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacklyn Laws | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Farrell | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Corr | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MANTLE | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|||||
pamela Roll | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly Ann Gorman | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Marshall | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian De'ath | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Garrett | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Craig | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine L Downey | Trustee | 06 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE EILEEN SHOVLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.32k | £15.65k | £20.87k | £32.51k | £20.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.82k | £15.72k | £14.86k | £30.55k | £24.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Stansfield Street
SUNDERLAND
SR6 0JY
- Phone:
- 01915485896
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window