Financial history MARGARET GIFFEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1022838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £129.12k £96.99k £62.07k £46.49k £90.91k
Total expenditure £966.20k £814.59k £447.88k £314.01k £91.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A