Financial history MANNA INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1022840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £56.22k £80.11k £55.35k £61.32k £77.09k
Total expenditure £62.23k £54.54k £50.93k £87.52k £100.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A