SOUTHAM UNITED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds are invested through Coif in a balanced portfolio which seeks to maintain values whilst providing a reasonable income for distribution. We also receive rents from land owned by the charities and these are managed by professional land agents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 21 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GAFFNEY | Chair | 05 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Angela Scull | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Cragg | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lee Ellard | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MICHAEL FOSTER | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARJORIE TRESSIDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEONARD GALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TERENCE GEORGE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN JOHN MEACHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.99k | £142.44k | £30.20k | £197.97k | £43.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.37k | £134.80k | £24.05k | £192.19k | £48.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
(1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS AND IN THE ORDER OF PRIORITY (A) AS TO NOT MORE THAN TWO THIRDS FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED; (B) AS TO RESIDUE THEREOF FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SOUTHAM (2)THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY APPLICABLE FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF SOUTHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SOUTHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
WRIGHT HASSALL
OLYMPUS AVENUE
TACHBROOK PARK
WARWICK
CV34 6BF
- Phone:
- 01926880734
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window