Accounts and annual returns WILLINGTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1022920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 27 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 23 May 2024 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 23 May 2024 147 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 30 April 2024 489 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 30 April 2024 489 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 April 2024 854 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 30 April 2024 854 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 25 April 2024 1213 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 29 April 2024 1217 days late Download Open in new window