Accounts and annual returns TARPORLEY C E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1022925
Charity reporting is up to date (117 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 October 2024 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 October 2023 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 July 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 November 2019 On Time Download Open in new window