Financial history TARPORLEY C E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1022925
Charity reporting is up to date (117 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £28.06k £48.70k £10.53k £16.24k £21.53k
Total expenditure £35.60k £59.10k £13.38k £4.84k £12.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A