MONMOUTHSHIRE ANTIQUARIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training for Arts/Culture serving Children, young people, adults, old people and the public generally in respect of archaeological and historical information in the County of Gwent and the Borders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 22 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr R Sian King | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tee | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Bailey | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
FRANCES YOUNSON | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr GILL WAKLEY | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Smith | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Canon Dr ARTHUR EDWARDS DR | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY HOPKINS | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DUNTON | Trustee | 07 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK RICHARD TUDOR LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR RAYMOND CLARENCE HOWELL PhD FSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Christabel Lynda Hutchings FSA | Trustee |
|
||||||
Alan Aberg | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN GARNHAM HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.17k | £2.69k | £5.40k | £2.80k | £2.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.61k | £1.63k | £2.75k | £3.99k | £6.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2017 as amended on 28 May 2022 as amended on 03 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARCHAEOLOGY ANTIQUITIES ARCHITECTURE AND HISTORY OF THE AREA.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF MONMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
14A Tutnalls Street
LYDNEY
Gloucestershire
GL15 5PF
- Phone:
- 07766010090
- Email:
- Janet.bailey3@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
htpp//www.monmouthshireantiquarianassociation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window