PEACOCK GYMNASIUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of educational courses and sports training facilities including boxing, martial arts, dance and football with a view to improving the quality of life through sports and education for the residents of Canning Town and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newham
Governance
- 22 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA JAYNE BOWERS BA | Chair | 30 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Bowers | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Newby | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WILLIAM DENNETT | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BILLY DODD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.71k | £108.83k | £61.03k | £25.99k | £23.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.10k | £338.10k | £143.70k | £47.98k | £44.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.36k | £57.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 01 December 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO THE INHABITANTS OF CANNING TOWN AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CANNING TOWN AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Peacock Gymnasium
Caxton Street North
London
E16 1JL
- Phone:
- 02075113799
- Email:
- martin@peacockgym.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window