Financial history FRIENDS OF THE BILLERICAY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1022965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.05k £7.86k £8.85k £13.27k £10.97k
Total expenditure £6.39k £7.40k £7.28k £9.23k £18.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A