Financial history OAKRIDGE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1022979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.04k £6.88k £9.04k £13.79k £14.87k
Total expenditure £2.89k £5.94k £11.64k £12.37k £15.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A