Financial history 1ST WHYTELEAFE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1022981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.03k £15.99k £14.21k £5.26k £12.12k
Total expenditure £15.75k £8.21k £7.68k £6.76k £12.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.28k £8.00k N/A N/A