ST MICHAELS COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A community nursery offering a range of pre-school activities for 2 1/2 to 5 year olds. The nursery is open Monday to Friday mornings, as well as Monday and Thursday afternoons until 2:45, with an optional lunch club on Tuesdays and Wednesdays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 September 2024
Total income includes £70,702 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miranda Masters | Chair | 09 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Bennett | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Archer-Hurst | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 13/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.42k | £123.99k | £114.14k | £118.60k | £131.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.12k | £103.28k | £110.48k | £124.72k | £127.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £81.71k | £82.50k | £74.43k | £73.73k | £70.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 September 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 September 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/1993 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NNEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MOLE VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VILLAGE HALL
DELL CLOSE
MICKLEHAM
SURREY
RH5 6EE
- Phone:
- 01372361021
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window