Accounts and annual returns FIRST STEP PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1022996
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 14 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 14 March 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 07 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 30 March 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2008 12 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 12 March 2009 On Time