Financial history FIRST STEP PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1022996
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £85.55k £96.82k £93.16k £96.15k £117.10k
Total expenditure £83.34k £95.01k £91.95k £93.45k £115.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A