SHEFFIELD METALLURGICAL AND ENGINEERING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Technical Lectures and Conference. Fund raising from Conference and Social Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 June 1993: Standard registration
- S M E A (Working name)
- SMEA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Colleen Mann | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Peter Morgan | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ruddlestone | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Needham | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kirton-Vaughan | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tomlinson | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.68k | £19.43k | £19.90k | £23.76k | £24.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.00k | £12.30k | £13.96k | £17.07k | £28.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 1993 as amended on 24 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND INSTRUCT THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY OF METALLURGICAL, ENGINEERING AND ALLIED INDUSTRIES IN SHEFFIELD AND IN NEIGHBOURING AREAS WITHIN SOUTH YORKSHIRE, NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE AND NORTH NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND GENERALLY TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP ALL ASPECTS OF THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND USE OF METALS AND THE PRACTICE OF METALLURGY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THEREIN
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 THE LAWNS
SHEFFIELD
S11 9FL
- Phone:
- 01142305650
- Email:
- secretary@smea1894.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window