THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX DRUG REHABILITATION CENTRE FOR WOMEN WITH CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To relieve and rehabilitate persons, and in particular women with children, who are suffering or who have suffered from drug or alcohol addiction or other form of addiction
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 June 1993: Standard registration
- RUSSIAN ORTHODOX WOMEN'S DRUG PROJECT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK PALMER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
HEULWEN ELIZABETH BAWOROWSKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Owen Beament | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICIA ADENIKE BALOGUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.10k | £60 | £60 | £60 | £20.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH JULY 1992
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE AND REHABILITATE PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR WOMEN WITH CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM DRUG OR ALCOHOL ADDICTION OR OTHER FORM OF ADDICTION; B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO DRUG MISUSE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH INTO DRUG MISUSE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; C) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF AND TO REHABILITATE DRUG ABUSERS AND IN PARTICULAR TO ENCOURAGE THE PARENTS OF SUCH PERSONS TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THEIR CHILDREN. D) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS POVERTY AND STRESS AMONG PERSONS PARTICULARLY AFFECTED BY OR DEPENDANT ON DRUGS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF SUCH PERSONS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND MEDICAL CARE AND TEMPORARY HOSTEL ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE S.E.LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
31B TORRIDON ROAD
CATFORD
LONDON
SE6 1AQ
- Phone:
- 02086987241
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window