OXFORD HARMONIC CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Oxford Harmonic Society is a large amateur choir under professional musical direction which gives public performances of choral works supported by a professional orchestra and soloists. It holds three concerts a year in major Oxford venues and rehearses for two hours weekly in Oxford from early September to late June.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 24 June 1993: Standard registration
- OXFORD HARMONIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA TOWNSEND | Chair | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robin James Wilson | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Martin | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Butcher | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Butler | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rainer Buhler | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margarita Ann Morris | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PETER MORRIS FRSA | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|||||
DIANA PICK | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.17k | £5.39k | £40.39k | £48.57k | £55.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.61k | £4.79k | £41.58k | £43.53k | £51.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2013 AS AMENDED ON 28 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OXFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Swinbourne Road
Littlemore
OXFORD
OX4 4PQ
- Phone:
- 01865714778
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window