Accounts and annual returns Abbotsham and Alwington Pre-School

Charity number: 1023074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 26 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 02 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 25 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window