Financial history Abbotsham and Alwington Pre-School

Charity number: 1023074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £112.26k £110.01k £101.66k £125.56k £131.71k
Total expenditure £99.87k £116.80k £104.88k £131.59k £125.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £102.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A