FIRST STEPS COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1023077

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PLAYGROUP, PROVIDING CHILD CARE FOR 2 - 5 YEAR OLDS also 2-11 YEAR OLD'S IN additional clubs- Holiday, ASC and BC

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £284,103
Total expenditure: £248,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FIRST STEPS COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Working name)
  • ST JAMES COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ZSANETT EZSIASNE Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
KIRSTY EDGE Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
JOANNE LITTLE Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
Charlotte Steer Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
NATALIA FERRERAS GRANADO Trustee 05 December 2013
None on record
ANDREA PUNTY Trustee 05 December 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £154.36k £144.15k £107.87k £113.89k £284.10k
Total expenditure £141.60k £134.60k £105.92k £103.46k £248.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £75.99k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.14k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 November 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 November 2021 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FIRST STEPS COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP
MARGARET ROAD
EXETER
EX4 7DQ
Phone:
01392251885
Website:

firststepsplaygroup.org.uk