Accounts and annual returns WORLD YOUTH MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1023085
Charity reporting is overdue by 1777 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 682 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1047 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1412 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1412 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1777 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1777 days