FRIENDS OF MARDEN MEDICAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations are collected from patients and their relatives and are used to purchase medical equipment for the doctors surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 25 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE HESKETH | Chair | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Kite | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Potter | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noreen Emily Davison | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Estall | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN TARRY | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAHAM STREETER | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.48k | £8.49k | £8.14k | £3.88k | £6.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.98k | £16.90k | £8.90k | £12.32k | £6.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 1993 as amended on 07 Apr 2022 as amended on 25 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONGST PERSONS TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY RESIDENT IN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE MARDEN MEDICAL CENTRE
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF MARDEN MEDICAL CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Bramley Court
Marden
Tonbridge
TN12 9QN
- Phone:
- 01622831716
- Email:
- GILLTARRY@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
mardenmedicalcentre.nhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window