KARIBU EDUCATION CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth work. Supplementary education. Summer Holiday Programme. Kinship Carers Support Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 30 June 1993: Standard registration
- ABENG YOUTH CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clovis Reid | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathy White | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Vernon Harris | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.19k | £225.30k | £85.58k | £117.10k | £111.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.21k | £142.48k | £113.79k | £132.58k | £132.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2023 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 April 2023 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 182 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 August 2022 | 547 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 August 2022 | 547 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8 AUGUST 1990 AS AMENDED 1ST JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KARIBU EDUCATION CENTRE
7 GRESHAM ROAD
LONDON
SW9 7PH
- Phone:
- 02077339423
- Email:
- karibuecentre@gmail.com
- Website:
-
karibueducationcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window