POTLEY HILL COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Potley Hill Community Preschool was established in 1979 and provides preschool learning and play facilities for children between the ages of 2 and 5 years in the Yateley area. The Preschool is based at Frogmore Campus, Potley Hill Road, Yateley. The Committee are the managing trustees and meet every month to manage and oversee the preschool's business affairs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £297,938 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 June 1993: Standard registration
- 14 December 2019: Funds received from 1031955 WESTFIELDS COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP
- POTLEYHILL COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Wallbank | Chair | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Pullinger | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Lewis | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie McCullogh | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lewis | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mirela Tiron | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Ashford | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Croser | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Norton | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Jackson | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.28k | £351.78k | £382.33k | £422.77k | £471.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.23k | £319.19k | £349.39k | £411.38k | £426.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £168.29k | £229.61k | £210.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.04k | £526 | £1.97k | £232.64k | £297.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Potley Hill Community Preschool
Frogmore Community Campus
Potley Hill Road
Yateley
Hampshire
GU46 6AG
- Phone:
- 01252869944
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window