Accounts and annual returns SUNSHINE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1023188
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 23 February 2010 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 23 February 2010 23 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 07 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 06 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 14 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time