Accounts and annual returns DOVE CENTRE FOR TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT

Charity number: 1023214
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 28 November 2008 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time