Financial history ST MARIE'S ROMAN CATHOLIC HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £21.94k £12.86k £22.08k £21.57k £19.33k
Total expenditure £20.69k £14.95k £18.97k £15.05k £24.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A