SUTTON POYNTZ VILLAGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sutton Poyntz Village WI operates in the village of Sutton Poyntz which is part of Weymouth in Dorset. The WI is part of National Federation of Women's Institutes, involving talks, lectures, crafts, acting, discusion and reading groups where women gain confidence and friends. The WI takes a positive interest in local and National issues and provides fellowship, enjoyment and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 June 1993: Standard registration
- 30 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- SUTTON PONTZ VILLAGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £2.10k | £2.32k | £4.18k | £3.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.12k | £2.14k | £1.96k | £2.53k | £3.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 23 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 18 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 17 January 2009 | 352 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 07 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 09 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | 06 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ANO RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SUTTON POYNTZ,PRESTON,WEYMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window