Accounts and annual returns LENHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1023306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 February 2024 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 February 2024 591 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 September 2021 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 September 2021 435 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required