NEWTON ABBOT PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age, by following the early years foundation stage through, observation, assessment and planning for all our children's needs. We are committee run by parents and grandparents who oversee the every day running of the setting and organise fundraising events throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 30 June 1993: Standard registration
- NEWTON ABBOTT PRE SCHOOL (SECRET GARDEN) (Previous name)
- WOLBOROUGH PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
christopher spurway | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah-Marie Jacqueline Lorraine James | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|||||
cara mperi | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Toms | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.87k | £62.00k | £62.52k | £48.00k | £44.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.80k | £51.00k | £50.70k | £46.00k | £40.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £32.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 689 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 July 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 July 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 August 2020 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 August 2020 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 13 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWTON ABBOT PRE SCHOOL
THE GREEN ROOMS
FISHER ROAD
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 2NB
- Phone:
- 07971708024
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window