Accounts and annual returns TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (IPSWICH)

Charity number: 1023335
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On Time