WRITTLE GREEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Writtle Green Pre-School provides learning facilities & pre-school education for infants from the age of 2 - 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £71,028 from 1 government contract(s) and £497 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 07 July 1993: Standard registration
- WRITTLE GREEN PLAYSCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRISHA JEAN WOOLNER | Chair | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elizabeth Lawrence | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Watkins | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Fox | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ailsa Ann Marie Birch | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sinead Folan | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annie Mullen | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.43k | £73.38k | £84.30k | £101.69k | £83.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.13k | £94.55k | £79.58k | £86.37k | £90.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £64.97k | £64.32k | £66.43k | £82.12k | £71.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.71k | £3.34k | £5.05k | £5.17k | £497 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Beryl Platt Centre
12-14 Redwood Drive
Writtle
CHELMSFORD
CM1 3LY
- Phone:
- 07950944612
- Email:
- wgp_s@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window