Financial history WEST BUCKLAND PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1023371
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £18.70k £31.83k £24.81k £28.51k £33.87k
Total expenditure £21.94k £25.13k £27.76k £29.62k £41.32k
Income from government contracts £11.97k £21.86k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £500 £0 N/A N/A