THE COMMON PURPOSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CPCT oversees the activities of CPUK, CP International,CP Customised Ltd, CP Global Customised and CP Asia Pacific. It safeguards brands, intellectual property, web domain names and trademarks, holds the overall strategic plan and supports the alumni. Our educational courses give people the inspiration, skills and connections to become better leaders at work and in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£5,487,894
Donations and legacies | £156.42k | |
Charitable activities | £5.12m | |
Other trading activities | £209.71k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,192,058
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £5.85m | |
Other | £341.58k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £217,200 from 21 government contract(s) and £22,500 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £341.58k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.85m |
People

70 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- India
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- COMMON PURPOSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Grace | Chair | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christine Ennew | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Sanjeev Gupta | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Lynna Chandra | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janis Sanders | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHUVO SAHA | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Donner | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK LINDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER KULLOI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.30m | £4.73m | £4.37m | £5.37m | £5.49m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.98m | £5.00m | £4.26m | £5.34m | £6.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £217.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £145.92k | £90.44k | N/A | £22.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £562.27k | £762.36k | £227.30k | £222.20k | £156.42k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £103.67k | £611.26k | £74.80k | £84.40k | £209.71k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.59m | £3.21m | £3.96m | £4.92m | £5.12m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £102 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £41.76k | £145.92k | £108.50k | £142.90k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.82m | £5.00m | £4.07m | £5.08m | £5.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.11k | £1.07m | £35.40k | £35.70k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £158.68k | £0 | £185.00k | £256.30k | £341.58k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £127.21k | £106.97k | £79.30k | £70.90k | £27.40k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £36.80k | |
|
Other assets | £2.45m | £2.16m | £3.77m | £2.95m | £3.27m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £863.37k | £825.57k | £2.29m | £1.43m | £2.46m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 June 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 20 June 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/1998 as amended on 28 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO EDUCATE MEN AND WOMEN FROM A BROAD RANGE OF GEOGRAPHICAL POLITICAL ETHNIC INSTITUTIONAL SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC BACKGROUNDS IN CONSTITUTIONAL CIVIC ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL STUDIES WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON CIVIL AND SOCIAL AWARENESS AND RESPONSIBILITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING CONTAINED IN THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION SHALL AUTHORIZE OR BE DEEMED TO AUTHORISE THE CARRYING ON OF ANY ACTIVITY FOR ANY PURPOSES SAVE THOSE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Linked charities
- 30 April 1998 : Standard registration
- 29 January 2024 : Removed
- 29 January 2024 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Monmouth House
38-40 Artillery Lane
London
E1 7LS
- Phone:
- 02076088100
- Email:
- info@commonpurpose.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window