Trustees BROUGHTON UNDER FIVES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1023385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Smyth Chair 12 September 2019
None on record
Ann Millership Trustee 24 February 2025
None on record
Mia Charlesworth Trustee 02 February 2024
None on record
Hayley Emma Bull Trustee 26 November 2023
None on record
Claire O'Leary Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record